MS SB2658 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 13-1)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-41-16, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Offense Of Abuse Of A Domesticated Dog Or Cat; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Domesticated dogs and cats; revise offense of abuse of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-01 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 64 N: 42 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 17 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 86 N: 17 NV: 17 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Immediate Release |
2020-07-01 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-19 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Yates,White |
2020-06-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Hill,England |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Amended |
2020-06-09 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Amended |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |