MS SB2649 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 33-7-119, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Placement Of Certain Federally Recognized Officers Or Enlisted Men On The Mississippi National Guard Retired List; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi National Guard retired list; clarify placement of federally recognized officers or men on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Carpenter,Newman,Stamps |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Seymour,DeLano,Turner-Ford |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Military Affairs |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-02-01 | Senate | DR - TSDP: VM To AC |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Veterans and Military Affairs;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |