MS SB2645 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 65-1-85, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Update Certain Publication And Bid Award Requirements; To Revise The Requirements For Design-build Projects Of The Mississippi Transportation Commission; To Allow The Mississippi Transportation Commission To Utilize Federally Approved Alternative Contracting Methods; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Department of Transportation; design-build requirement revisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2024-04-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Currie, Massengill, Tubb) |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Committee Substitute Failed |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Reconsidered |
2024-03-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-12 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |