MS SB2645 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-31-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Number Of Assistant District Attorneys In Certain Circuit Court Districts; To Amend Section 25-31-10, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Number Of Criminal Investigators Authorized To Be Appointed In Certain Circuit Court Districts; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Circuit court districts; increase number of assistant district attorneys and criminal investigators.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-27 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2023-03-24 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Yates,Read |
2023-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Yates,Newman |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,DeBar,Hopson |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2023-03-08 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2023-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2023-03-07 | House | Amended |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2023-02-28 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To JB |
2023-02-23 | House | DR - TSDPAA: JB To AP |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Appropriations |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: AP To JA |
2023-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: JA To AP |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Appropriations |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 31 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
25 | 31 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |