MS SB2640 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-6-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership Of The Minimum Standards Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Minimum Standards Board; revise membership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-25 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-04 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-31 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Bailey,Evans (91st),Jones (111th) | |
2010-03-17 | Conferees Named Tollison,Turner,Ward | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-25 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-05 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-04 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |