MS SB2634 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 446 Located In Bolivar County, Mississippi, As The "h.m. "mack" Grimmett Memorial Highway"; To Designate A Segment Of Mississippi Highway 28 Located In The Soso, Jones County, Mississippi, As The "paul Holifield Memorial Highway; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Memorial highways; designate segments in Bolivar County and Jones County as in honor individuals.
Sponsors
Sen. Hob Bryan [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-05-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-24 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Massengill,Tubb,Arnold |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Conferees Named Branning,Bryan,Younger |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-11 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Amended |
2024-04-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Scoggin, Massengill, Tubb) |
2024-04-04 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-04 | House | Amended |
2024-03-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-11 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |