MS SB2634 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-09 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 27-104-7, 29-5-2 And 31-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Provisions That Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Enter Into Contracts To Provide Parking Spaces For State Employees Who Work In The Woolfolk Building, The Carroll Gartin Justice Building Or The Walter Sillers Office Building; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State employee parking arrangements; extend repealer on authority of DFA to contract for.
Sponsors
Sen. Carl Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-09 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-04 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-02 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-03-01 | Passed | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Public Property | |
2010-02-09 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-08 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Public Property |