MS SB2633 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-61-63, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The State Medical Examiner May Enter Into Contracts With Accredited Medical Schools To Perform Certain Autopsies Under Certain Conditions; To Bring Forward Sections 41-61-55, 41-61-59, 41-61-61 And 41-61-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For Purposes Of Possible Amendments To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Autopsies; Medical Examiner may enter into contracts with medical schools to perform.
Sponsors
Sen. John Polk [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-08 | House | Died On Calendar |
2017-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |
2017-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Amended |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-31 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AC |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |