MS SB2624 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Architects And Engineers Good Samaritan Act; To Provide Immunity From Liability For Any Civil Actions Arising From Work Performed By Architects Or Engineers At The Request Of An Elected Official During A State Of Emergency; To Provide That The Immunity Provided By This Act Shall Only Apply To Safety Assessment Services; To Bring Forward Section 11-46-9, Which Exempts Governmental Entities From Liability Under Certain Circumstances For Purposes Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Architects and Engineers Good Samaritan Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-08 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2022-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |