MS SB2621 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish A "task Force To Study Mississippi's Laws Regarding The Awarding And Calculating Of Child Support, Alimony And Other Related Matters In Domestic Law"; To Prescribe The Membership Of The Task Force And Provide For Its Organization; To Provide For A Report By The Task Force; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Task Force; establish to study domestic law matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Brice Wiggins [R] | Sen. Tyler McCaughn [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Benjamin Suber [R] |
Sen. David Parker [R] | Sen. Jeremy England [R] | Sen. Angela Burks Hill [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-04-05 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2021-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2021-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Cockerham,Tullos,Blackmon |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Wiggins,Parker,Boyd |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2021-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2021-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2021-03-09 | House | Amended |
2021-03-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2021-02-26 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |