MS SB2618 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 2 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-02 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 83-17-401, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Definition Of "adjuster" Within The Laws Regarding Licensing Of Insurance Adjusters To Make An Exception For Persons Who Collect Claim Information From, Or Furnish Claim Information To, Insureds Or Claimants, And Who Perform Data Entry Including Entering Data Into An Automated Claims Adjudication System, If The Person Is An Employee Of A Licensed Independent Adjuster Or Its Affiliate Where No More Than 25 Such Persons Are Under The Supervision Of One Licensed Independent Adjuster Or Licensed Agent; To Amend Section 83-17-407, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Commissioner Of Insurance From Denying Reciprocity For An Insurance Adjuster Applicant With A Valid License From Another State Solely Because That Person Is Not A Resident Of The United States Of America; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance adjusters; provide certain exemption to licensure requirement of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-21 - House - House Passed (Y: 78 N: 40 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-02 | Approved by Governor | |
2012-03-27 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-26 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-03-23 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-23 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2012-03-21 | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Eaton, Chism, Buck (5th), Banks) | |
2012-03-21 | Passed | |
2012-03-21 | Amendment Failed | |
2012-03-20 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-03-14 | Referred To Insurance | |
2012-03-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2012-03-07 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Insurance |