MS SB2610 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 20 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-20 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-136, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Use Of Cannabidiol In Research Of Treatments For Seizures And Other Medical Conditions; To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform Schedule I To The Requirements Of This Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabidiol; clarify use in research of seizures and other medical conditions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-02 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-20 Approved by Governor
2017-03-14HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2017-03-06HouseReturned For Enrolling
2017-03-02HousePassed
2017-02-23HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2017-02-21HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2017-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2017-02-07SenatePassed
2017-02-07SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2017-01-31SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2017-01-31SenateDR - TSDPCS: PH To JA
2017-01-16SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare;Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback