MS SB2604 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-39-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Statute Providing Energy Efficiency Standards For Commercial Buildings; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Energy efficiency building standards adopted by local governments; extend repealer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Energy |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Energy |