MS SB2594 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 45-33-23, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 45-33-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Registration Under The Act; To Amend Section 45-33-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Number Of Days Within Which Registration Is Required; To Create New Section 45-33-28, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Registration Of An Offender Housed At A Shelter During A Natural Disaster Or Other Emergency; To Amend Section 45-33-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Responsibility Of A Registrant To Update Registration Information; To Amend Section 45-33-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Notification Of Other Law Enforcement Agencies; To Amend Section 45-33-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalty For Violations; To Amend Section 45-33-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Responsibility Of A Registrant To Update Registration Information; To Amend Section 45-33-36, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Notification Given To Other Interested Parties; To Amend Section 45-33-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Registration Duties Of A Court Under The Act; To Amend Section 45-33-47, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create A Three-tier Classification Of Offenses To Correlate With The Length Of Time During Which Continuing Registration Is Required; To Amend Section 45-33-49, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Department's Responsibility To Maintain A Website And Provide Public Notice; To Amend Section 47-7-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sex offender registration; revise to comply with federal mandates.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-02 | Died In Committee | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary B | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-14 | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |