MS SB2588 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-03 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Codify Section 65-31-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize And Direct The Mississippi Department Of Transportation To Designate The State Hospitality Station Located In Vicksburg, Warren County, On The Mississippi River, As The "commissioner Dick Hall Hospitality Station"; And For Related Purposes.
Title
"Commissioner Dick Hall Hospitality Station"; MDOT to designate Warren County Welcome Center as.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-03 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-02-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-02-24 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-02-23 | House | Passed |
2023-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Transportation |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Passed |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |