MS SB2582 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 10 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer And Convey Certain Real Property At 300 Capers Avenue Within The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Partition, Transfer And Convey To The Mississippi Department Of Public Safety Certain Real Property Located Within The City Of Hattiesburg, Forrest County, Mississippi; To Authorize The East Tallahatchie School District To Transfer Certain Real Property To The City Of Charleston, Mississippi; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Capers Avenue property; authorize DFA to transfer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-01 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-04-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2014-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2014-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Jackson,Boyd |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Jackson (11th) |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-15 | House | Referred To Public Property |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |