MS SB2579 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 43-21-321, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Sponsoring School District Or Private Provider Agreed Upon By The Youth Court And School District Shall Be Responsible For Providing The Instructional Program For The Detainee While In Detention During The Academic School Year When School Is In Session; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Provision of educational services to detained students while school is in session; clarify.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Bennett,DeLano,Roberson |
2018-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Wiggins,Blackwell |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-22 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-22 | House | Amended |
2018-02-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Education |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Education |