MS SB2575 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-973, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Circuit Judges From Allowing Any Candidate For Justice Of The Supreme Court, Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Circuit Judge Or Chancellor To Address The Public During Court Terms; To Delete The Prohibition Against Any Candidate For Justice Of The Supreme Court, Judge Of The Court Of Appeals, Circuit Judge Or Chancellor Aligning Himself Or Herself With Any Candidate Or Candidates For Any Other Office Or With Any Political Faction Or Any Political Party At Any Time During Any Primary Or General Election Campaign; To Delete The Penalty For Doing So; To Amend Section 23-15-976, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Prohibition Against A Political Party Fundraising On Behalf Of Or Endorsing A Candidate Or Office Holder Of A Nonpartisan Judicial Office; To Delete The Prohibition Against A Candidate Or Candidate's Political Committee For A Nonpartisan Judicial Office Accepting A Contribution From A Political Party; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Judicial candidates; revise political limitations on.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 29 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-16 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-10 | Senate | Amended |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
23 | 15 | 973 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
23 | 15 | 976 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |