MS SB2572 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 75-67-525, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Reporting Of An Uncollected Amount Of A Delayed Deposit Check By Any Person Who Engages In The Business Of Check Cashing Without First Securing A License Shall Constitute A Per Se Violation Of The Federal Fair Credit Reporting Act; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Check cashers; reporting of uncollected payment to credit reporting agency by unlicensed check casher is per se violation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | House | Died In Committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Banking and Financial Services |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Business and Financial Institutions |