MS SB2564 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 37-153-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define "office" As The Mississippi Office Of Workforce Development; To Amend Section 37-153-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Office And Provide That The Mississippi State Workforce Investment Board Shall Serve As The Advisory Board For The Office; To Revise The Membership And Duties Of The Mississippi State Workforce Investment Board; To Require Each State Agency, Department And Institution To Report Any Monies Received For Workforce Training Activities Or Career And Technical Education And An Itemization Of How Those Monies Were Spent To The Mississippi State Workforce Investment Board; To Require The Mississippi State Workforce Investment Board To Compile The Data And Provide A Report Of The Monies And Expenditures To The Chairs Of The House And Senate Appropriations Committee, The Chair Of The House Workforce Development Committee And The Chair Of The Senate Economic And Workforce Development Committee By October 1 Of Each Year; To Replace The Rules Committee Of The State Workforce Investment Board With An Executive Committee, And To Determine The Membership And Duties Of The Executive Committee; To Provide That The Executive Committee Shall Select An Executive Director Of The Office, And To Establish The Qualifications And Duties Of The Executive Director; To Provide That The Office Shall Collaborate With The Mississippi Community College Board In Administering And Overseeing The Mississippi Workforce Enhancement Training Fund And Mississippi Works Fund; To Require The Office To File An Annual Report With The Governor, Secretary Of State And Legislature By October 1 Of Each Year Regarding All Funds Approved To Be Expended On Workforce Training During The Prior Calendar Year; To Amend Sections 37-153-11, 37-153-13, 71-5-353 And 71-5-453, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity To The Above; To Amend Section 60, Chapter 572, Laws Of 2004, As Last Amended By Section 58, Chapter 451, Laws Of 2019, Which Is The Repealer For The Chapter, To Exclude The Sections Of The Chapter Corresponding To Sections 37-153-1 Through 37-153-13; To Create New Section 37-153-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Codify The Repealer Of Sections 37-153-1 Through 37-153-13, And To Add Section 37-153-15 As Subject To The Repealer; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Office of Workforce Development; establish.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-16 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-08 Approved by Governor
2020-07-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-07-01HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2020-06-29HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Bell (21st), Walker)
2020-06-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2020-06-26SenateConference Report Adopted
2020-06-25HouseConference Report Filed
2020-06-25SenateConference Report Filed
2020-06-24HouseConferees Named Bell (21st),White,Haney
2020-06-23SenateConferees Named Parker,England,Kirby
2020-06-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-17HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-16HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-16HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Workforce Development
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-10SenatePassed As Amended
2020-03-10SenateAmended
2020-03-10SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-02SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-17SenateReferred To Economic and Workforce Development

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/history/SB/SB2564.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2564IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2564CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2564PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/SB/2500-2599/SB2564SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/sam/SB2564_S_(Cmte_Sub)_Amend_01.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2020/html/ham/SB2564_H_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/0640030.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1620020.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/senate/1720008.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2020/pdf/votes/house/1740030.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback