MS SB2561 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-21-13, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Wide-ranging Application Of Emergency Domestic Abuse Protection Orders; To Amend Section 93-21-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Wide-ranging Application Of Other Domestic Abuse Protection Orders; To Create New Section 93-21-15.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Appellate Procedures For Appeals Of Domestic Abuse Protection Orders, And To Specify When Such Appeals Are On The Record Or Are De Novo; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Domestic abuse protection orders; revise appellate procedure.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 115 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 109 N: 4 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2019-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Clark,Bain |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Turner-Ford |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2019-03-12 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | Amended |
2019-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |