MS SB2545 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-17-71, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Penalties For Violations Of Purchase Transactions For Scrap Metal; To Revise Definitions By Adding Certain Terms; To Require Record Keeping For Dealer To Dealer Transactions; To Regulate Delivery Of Metal Property By A Person Other Than The Seller Who Delivers Metal Property; To Provide That The Sale Of Certain Telecommunication Wire Shall Be Unlawful; To Provide That This Section Shall Take Precedence Over Local Ordinances Governing Purchase Transactions Of Metal Property; To Amend Section 97-17-71.1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require A Registrant To Declare Whether The Registrant Has Ever Been Convicted Of Any Felony Offense Or Any Misdemeanor Offense Involving Fraud, Dishonesty, Or Deceit Within Five Years Preceding The Date Of Application; To Provide That A Registrant Convicted Of Such An Offense May Be Prohibited From Registering For Five Years From The Date Of Conviction; To Provide That It Is Unlawful For A Person To Make Certain False Or Misleading Statements; To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Compel Or Allow A Person To Testify Or Produce A Record Under Certain Circumstances; To Require The Secretary Of State To Hold An Administrative Hearing Within A Certain Number Of Business Days Of Issuing An Immediate Cease And Desist Order; To Amend Section 97-17-71.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Purchase Of Any Air Conditioner Evaporator Coil Is Subject To Certain Record Keeping Requirements; To Create New Section 97-17-71.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide Requirements For The Purchase And Acquisition Of Certain Catalytic Converters Not Attached To A Motor Vehicle; To Provide That It Is Unlawful For Any Person To Transfer Or Purchase A Used, Detached Catalytic Converter Without Meeting The Requirements Of This Section; To Provide Criminal Penalties For Violations; And For Related Purposes
Title
Scrap metal; revise provisions of and prescribe certain conditions for the purchase of detached catalytic converters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2022-04-04 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Sanford,Felsher |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Thompson,Whaley |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-08 | House | Amended |
2022-02-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-14 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |