MS SB2539 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Supervisors Of Hinds County, Mississippi, To Levy An Assessment, In Addition To Any Other Assessments And Court Costs, For Convictions Obtained In Its Justice, County And Circuit Courts, To Be Used To Fund Repairs To And Renovations Of The Courthouses And Pretrial Detention Facilities Of Hinds County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Hinds County; authorize assessments on convictions for improvements to courthouses and pretrial detention facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-27 - House - House Passed (Y: 109 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2021-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2021-03-28 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2021-03-27 | House | Passed |
2021-03-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-03-19 | House | Referred To Local and Private Legislation |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Passed |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | Senate | Referred To Local and Private |