MS SB2525 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Forestry Facility Grant Fund And Program To Be Used For Utility, Infrastructure And Transportation Projects With A $10,000,000.00 Investment; To Provide That Such Funds Shall Be Administered By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Prescribe Certain Conditions On Allocations From The Fund; To Prescribe Eligible Costs From Which Monies From The Fund May Be Allocated; To Authorize Cooperative Agreements For The Implementation Of Such Grants; To Amend Section 57-1-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity With The Preceding Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Forestry; create the Forestry Facility Grant Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 4 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2023-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2023-03-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2023-03-01 | House | Passed |
2023-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2023-02-28 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To FO |
2023-02-21 | House | DR - TSDP: FO To AP |
2023-02-13 | House | Referred To Forestry;Appropriations |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2023-01-25 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: FO To FI |
2023-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Forestry;Finance |