MS SB2525 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Advocate Confidentiality Law; To Provide That Communications Of Victims Of Domestic Violence, Sexual Assault, Stalking And Human Trafficking With Advocates Are Confidential; To Establish Procedures For Disclosure In Limited Circumstances; To Provide For In-camera Review Before Disclosure; To Amend Section 93-21-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Advocate confidentiality law; protect certain information held by rape crisis and domestic violence programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29SenateDied In Conference
2019-03-27HouseConferees Named Cockerham,McNeal,Bain
2019-03-27SenateConferees Named Hopson,Doty,Branning
2019-03-20SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-14HouseMotion to Reconsider Tabled
2019-03-13HouseMotion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Cockerham, Bailey)
2019-03-13HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-12HouseRead the Third Time
2019-03-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-19HouseRereferred To Judiciary B
2019-02-12SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-11SenatePassed
2019-02-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback