MS SB2524 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 23 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Name The Mississippi State Public Health Laboratory In Jackson, Mississippi, For Dr. F.e. "ed" Thompson, Jr.; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Public Health Laboratory; name for Dr. Ed Thompson.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-20 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-02-15 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-21 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services | |
2010-01-20 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-20 | Immediate Release | |
2010-01-20 | Passed | |
2010-01-19 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-13 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |