MS SB2505 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-27 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create "nathan's Law"; To Amend Section 63-3-615, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Offense Of Passing A School Bus When Stopped To Load Or Unload Students And To Revise The Penalty Therefor; To Amend Section 63-1-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Use Of Wireless Devices In School Crossings Without Using Hands-free Accessories And To Require The State Department Of Education To Develop And Issue Curriculum Guidelines To School Districts For Implementation Of A School Bus Safety Curriculum; To Amend Section 63-1-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Driver's License Examination Requirements To Ensure Coverage Thereon Of School Bus Safety Issues; To Authorize Cameras On School Bus Stop Arms; To Authorize The Department Of Transportation To Conduct A Public Education Campaign On School Bus Safety; To Create A School Bus Safety Taskforce; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nathan's law; increase penalty for unlawful passing of school bus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-22 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-27 | Died In Conference | |
2010-03-10 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Clark | |
2010-03-08 | Conferees Named Fillingane,McDaniel,Watson | |
2010-03-08 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-04 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-02 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Amended | |
2010-03-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-27 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-01-26 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-01-22 | Passed | |
2010-01-21 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-12 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |