MS SB2485 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act Entitled The "right To Try Act"; To Authorize Licensed Physicians To Prescribe Or Recommend Certain Investigational Drugs, Biological Products Or Devices To Certain Eligible Terminally Ill Patients; To Provide Definitions; To Amend Section 73-25-37, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Investigational drugs; authorize physicians to prescribe to certain eligible terminally ill patients.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 48 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-29 Approved by Governor
2015-03-24HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-03-24SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2015-03-19SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2015-03-19SenateReconsidered
2015-03-19SenateMotion to Reconsider Entered
2015-03-18SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2015-03-12HouseReturned For Concurrence
2015-03-11HousePassed As Amended
2015-03-11HouseAmended
2015-03-09HouseRead the Third Time
2015-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2015-02-24HouseReferred To Public Health and Human Services
2015-02-06SenateTransmitted To House
2015-02-05SenatePassed
2015-01-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2015-01-19SenateReferred To Public Health and Welfare

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback