MS SB2473 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-16 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The "prohibition Against Employer Intimidation Act"; To Provide That No Person, Organization, Corporation, Union, Agency Or Other Entity Thereof May Damage, Harm, Injure Or Threaten To Injure Or Coerce A Business, Or Any Employee Or Representative Of The Business With The Intent To Unlawfully Intimidate The Business Or Its Employees; To Provide That No Person, Organization, Corporation, Union, Agency Or Other Entity Thereof May Conspire With Another, For The Purpose Of Disrupting Lawful Commerce In Places Of Business; To Provide That No Person, Organization, Corporation, Union, Agency Or Other Entity Shall Intentionally Or Recklessly Damage Business Property Of Another In Any Manner; And For Related Purposes.
Title
The "Prohibition Against Employer Intimidation Act"; create.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Brown [R] | Sen. Giles Ward [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-26 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 38 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 69 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 69 N: 52 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 34 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-16 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-29 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-29 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-26 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2014-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-06 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-03-05 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Evans (70th), Turner, Crawford) |
2014-03-05 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2014-03-05 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2014-03-05 | House | Amended |
2014-02-25 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-02-18 | House | Referred To S.C. Accountblty,Efficiency,Transparency |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |