MS SB2467 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Section 83-34-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Monies Derived From The Nonadmitted Policy Fee To Be Deposited Into The Rural Fire Truck Fund Or Supplementary Rural Fire Truck Fund And To Extend The Repealer Thereon; To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round For The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Windstorm Underwriting Association; extend repealer on nonadmitted policy fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-27 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 100 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 100 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 98 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-04-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-27 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2018-03-26 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2018-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Chism,Turner,Hines |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Blackwell,Parks |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2018-02-23 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-02-21 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-21 | House | Amended |
2018-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Insurance |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |