MS SB2464 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-26 - Conferees Named Horan,Mickens,Goodin
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Expand Offenders' Access To Administrative Reductions In Time Through The Trusty-time Program And The Earned-time Allowance Program; To Provide That Offenders Convicted Of Crimes That Prohibit Reductions In Sentence Shall Be Ineligible For Such Programs; To Amend Sections 47-5-138.1, 47-5-139 And 47-7-3.2, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Trusty and earned-time programs; change eligibility to participate in.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-17 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 95 N: 22 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 29 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-26HouseConferees Named Horan,Mickens,Goodin
2020-06-22SenateConferees Named Barnett,Sparks,McCaughn
2020-06-22SenateDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2020-06-19HouseReturned For Concurrence
2020-06-17HousePassed As Amended
2020-06-17HouseAmended
2020-06-09HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2020-06-09HouseDR - TSDPAA: JB To CN
2020-06-03HouseDR - TSDPAA: CN To JB
2020-03-25HouseReferred To Corrections;Judiciary B
2020-03-13SenateTransmitted To House
2020-03-12SenatePassed
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Substitute Adopted
2020-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2020-02-14SenateReferred To Corrections

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback