MS SB2463 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That The University Of Mississippi Medical Center As The Lead Agency, Together With The State Department Of Health, The Division Of Medicaid And The Mississippi Health Information Network, Shall Cooperate With Each Other In Preparing A Comprehensive Report On The State Of Rare Diseases In Mississippi, Including The Incidence Of Rare Diseases In The State, The Status Of The Rare Disease Community, And Treatment And Services Provided To Persons With Rare Diseases In The State; To Provide That The Report Shall Be Presented To The Chairs Of Certain Legislative Committees Not Later Than December 1, 2019; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Rare diseases; UMMC and other agencies shall prepare report on the state of in Mississippi.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Approved by Governor | |
2018-03-13 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Concurred in Amend From House |
2018-03-05 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-03-01 | House | Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2018-02-27 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To PH |
2018-02-22 | House | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP |
2018-02-19 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services;Appropriations |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Amended |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-24 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: PH To AP |
2018-01-15 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations |