MS SB2463 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Provide That In The Chickasaw County And Houston Municipal Separate School District There Shall Be An Administrative Consolidation Into One School District To Be Designated As The Chickasaw County School District Effective July 1, 2021; To Provide For A Superintendent Of Schools For The New Chickasaw County School District; To Provide For The Composition Of The Board Of Education Of The New Chickasaw County School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Administratively Consolidate Any School District Which Does Not Voluntarily Follow The Consolidation Order; To Abolish The Former School Districts Following The Administrative Consolidation And Provide For The Transfer Of School District Assets And Liabilities; To Provide For Execution Of Teacher And School District Employee Contracts And The Preparation Of A School District Budget In The New School District; To Direct The State Board Of Education To Promulgate Regulations To Implement Such Administrative Consolidation; To Provide A Two-year Waiver From Accountability And State Assessment Requirements For The New Student Population; To Amend Sections 37-7-103 And 37-5-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity; To Amend Section 37-7-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Election Of School Board Members In A Certain School District Beginning With The November 2017 Municipal Election And The 2018 Congressional Mid-term Election Respective To The Trustee Districts Eligible For Election At Such Time And Every Four Years Thereafter; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School district consolidation; require in Chickasaw County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 67 N: 47 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 63 N: 44 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-29 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Roberson,Barker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Clarke,Caughman |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Education |
2017-02-03 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |