MS SB2452 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 73-50-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That An Occupational Licensing Board Issuing A License, Certification Or Registration To A Military Spouse Shall Approve Or Deny The Application Within A Certain Amount Of Time If The Spouse's Orders Are In Mississippi For 36 Months Or Less; To Require Occupational Licensing Boards To Adopt Rules Necessary To Implement This Section By A Certain Date; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Occupational licensing boards; require prompt licensure for certain military spouse applicants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29 Approved by Governor
2019-03-26HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-26SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-20SenateConcurred in Amend From House
2019-03-14HouseReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-12HousePassed As Amended
2019-03-12HouseAmended
2019-02-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-02-19HouseReferred To Military Affairs
2019-02-08SenateTransmitted To House
2019-02-06SenatePassed As Amended
2019-02-06SenateAmended
2019-01-30SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21SenateReferred To Veterans and Military Affairs

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback