MS SB2452 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Establish The 2015 Mississippi Works Scholarship Pilot Program To Assist Career And Technical Education (cte) Students Who Enroll At Mississippi Community Colleges To Complete A Cte Certificate Or Degree; To Provide That The Program Shall Be Administered By The Postsecondary Education Financial Assistance Board; To Prescribe Qualifications For The Program; To Provide That The Program Is Contingent On Appropriated Funds; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Works Scholarship Pilot Program to assist Career and Technical Education (CTE) students at community colleges; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-30 | Senate | Died In Conference |
2015-03-30 | House | Conferees Named Mettetal,Holloway,Beckett |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conferees Named Polk,Hale,Burton |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-10 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-09 | House | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-09 | House | Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-03-03 | House | DR - TSDPAA: AP To UC |
2015-02-25 | House | DR - TSDPAA: UC To AP |
2015-02-24 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |
2015-02-13 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-29 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: UC To AP |
2015-01-19 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Appropriations |