MS SB2445 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 47-5-473, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Mississippi Correctional Facility Pilot Work Release Program And Include Hinds County; To Amend Section 47-5-577, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of Repeal On The Mississippi Prison Industries Act Of 1990 From July 1, 2024, To July 1, 2027, And To Transfer The Repealer In Section 47-5-579 To Section 47-5-577; To Amend Sections 47-5-579 And 47-5-539, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Administrative Percentages And The Inmate Savings Percentages Under The Mdoc Work Release Program And To Expand The Pilot Work Initiative To Any State, Regional Or Private Correctional Facility, Under Certain Conditions; To Bring Forward Sections 47-5-531, 47-5-533, 47-5-535, 47-5-537, 47-5-543, 47-5-545, 47-5-547, 47-5-549, 47-5-551, 47-5-553, 47-5-555, 47-5-557, 47-5-561, 47-5-563, 47-5-565, 47-5-567, 47-5-569, 47-5-571, 47-5-573 And 47-5-575, Mississippi Code Of 1972; To Amend Sections 47-5-541, 47-5-559 And 47-5-1251, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Correctional system programs; extend repealers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | Approved by Governor | |
2024-04-28 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2024-04-25 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2024-04-23 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-23 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2024-04-17 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Horan,Faulkner |
2024-04-16 | House | Conferees Named Currie,Horan,Rushing |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Conferees Named Barnett,Chassaniol,Sparks |
2024-04-11 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2024-04-04 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2024-04-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2024-04-03 | House | Amended |
2024-03-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2024-03-18 | House | Referred To Corrections |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Corrections |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 5 | 1251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 473 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 531 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 533 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 535 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 537 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 539 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 541 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 543 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 545 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 547 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 549 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 551 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 553 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 555 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 557 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 559 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 561 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 563 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 565 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 567 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 569 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 571 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 573 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 575 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 577 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 5 | 579 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |