MS SB2445 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Felony Of Possession With Intent To Defraud Of A Credit Card Skimmer; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Pay and Trade with Confidence and Electronic Device Tampering Act; create.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House Passed (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-14 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-13 | House | Passed |
2019-03-12 | House | Read the Third Time |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Passed |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |