MS SB2439 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 28 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-28 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Provide That Money In The Fund Shall Be Used For The Purpose Of Making Training Grants To Business Enterprises That Are Eligible For The Jobs Tax Credit Authorize Under Section 57-73-21; To Provide That The Fund Shall Be Administered By The Mississippi Development Authority; To Provide That A Business Enterprise That Receives Such A Training Grant Shall Not Be Eligible For The Jobs Tax Credit Authorized In Section 57-73-21; To Provide For The Duration And Amount Of The Training Grants; To Provide That The Mississippi Development Authority Shall Require That The Business Enterprise Shall Enter Into Binding Commitments Requiring That A Minimum Number Of Jobs Be Maintained That Shall Be Not Less Than The Number Of Jobs Required To Be Eligible For The Jobs Tax Credit, And That If The Minimum Number Of Jobs Are Not Maintained, All Or A Portion Of The Grant Funds Received By The Business Enterprise, As Determined By The Mississippi Development Authority, Shall Be Repaid; To Provide That The Liability Of The State Of Mississippi To Make The Training Grants Authorized Under This Act Shall Be Limited To The Balance Contained In The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Require The Transfer Of $2,000,000.00 From The Mmeia Tax Incentive Fund To The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To End The Monthly Deposit Of Sales Tax Revenue In The Amount Of $150,000.00 Into The Mmeia Tax Incentive Fund And Provide For The Monthly Deposit Of Sales Tax Revenue In The Amount Of $150,000.00 Into The Mississippi Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; To Amend Section 57-73-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Repeal Sections 57-101-1, 57-101-3 And 57-101-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Mmeia Tax Incentive Fund To Pay A Portion Of The Component Construction Material Costs For Certain Projects; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MS Development Authority Job Training Grant Fund; create to provide job training grants for certain eligible business enterprises.
Sponsors
Sen. Joey Fillingane [R] | Sen. Kelvin Butler [D] | Sen. Thomas Gollott [R] | Sen. John Horhn [D] |
Sen. Philip Moran [R] | Sen. Derrick Simmons [D] | Sen. Willie Simmons [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 117 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-28 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2013-03-07 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2013-03-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-03-06 | House | Amended |
2013-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Passed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |