MS SB2437 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-101-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Taxing Entities To File Their Annual Report On Tax Revenues With The Department Of Revenue Instead Of The State Auditor; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Taxing entities; require to file annual report on tax revenues with Department of Revenue instead of State Auditor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-02 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed |
2017-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Finance |