MS SB2435 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-19-31, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Requirement For Apportioned Vehicles To Have A Decal Specifying The Month And Year Of Expiration Attached To The License Tag; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; remove requirement for apportioned vehicles to have decal with expiration month and year on license tag.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | House | Died In Committee |
2020-03-25 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Passed |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Finance |