MS SB2432 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-16-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Special Mississippi Occupational Diploma For Students With Disabilities Shall Not Be Available To Any Student Entering The Ninth Grade In The 2017-2018 School Year Or Thereafter; To Amend Section 37-16-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Career Track Program For Students Not Pursuing A Baccalaureate Degree Shall Not Be Available To Any Student Entering The Ninth Grade In The 2017-2018 School Year Or Thereafter; To Amend Section 37-23-147, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Process By Which Schools Providing Full Inclusion Of Students With Disabilities In All Academic And Extracurricular Activities Are Recognized; To Rename The Oversight Committee As The Mississippi Special Education Advisory Panel; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Occupational Diploma for students with disabilities and career track program; suspend for new students.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 96 N: 22 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-04-03 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-29 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-03-28 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moore, Roberson) |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2017-03-26 | House | Conferees Named Moore,Roberson,Crawford |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Tollison,Blackwell,Wilemon |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2017-03-09 | House | Returned For Concurrence |
2017-03-07 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-03-07 | House | Amended |
2017-02-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred To Education |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | Senate | Referred To Education |