MS SB2425 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-3-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Limitation On The Salary Of The State Superintendent Of Public Education; To Amend Section 37-4-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Limitation On The Salary Of The Executive Director Of The Community College Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State Superintendent of Public Education and Director of the Community College Board; set maximum salaries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Appropriations |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Motion to Reconsider Entered |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Amended |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-31 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-27 | Senate | DR - TSDPCS: UC To ED |
2022-01-26 | Senate | DR - TSDP: ED To UC |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Education;Universities and Colleges |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 3 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 4 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |