MS SB2425 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Diversion To Certain Counties Of A Portion Of The Sales Tax Revenue Collected On Business Activities Within A Redevelopment Project Developed Under The Tax Increment Financing Act If The County Has Issued Bonds Under The Tax Increment Financing Act To Finance All Or A Portion Of Such Redevelopment Project, Any Debt Service For Such Indebtedness Is Outstanding, And A Development With A Value Of $10,000,000.00 Or More Is, Or Will Be, Located In The Redevelopment Area; To Require The Revenue From Such Diversion To Be Utilized To Satisfy Such Indebtedness; To Provide That The Diversion Shall End The Month The Indebtedness Is Satisfied; To Amend Section 21-45-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales taxation; divert portion of revenue to certain counties in which certain tax increment finance projects are located.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 39 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2019-03-19 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2019-03-11 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2019-03-07 | House | Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
2019-02-01 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Passed |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2019-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Finance |