MS SB2425 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-22 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-239, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The County Executive Committee And The Commissioners Of Election To Offer An Annual Training Course Of Up To Eight Hours To Managers Of Election; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Elections; change the length of training course required for managers/pollworkers.
Sponsors
Sen. Sally Doty [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-22 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Elections |