MS SB2425 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 41-26-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require At Least Two Members Of Certain Governing Boards Of Community Public Water Systems To Attend The Continuing Management Training For A Minimum Of Four Hours Per Individual Beginning Within The Four Years Of January 1, 2014, And Every Four Years Thereafter; To Authorize The State Department Of Health To Charge A Fee To Defray The Cost Of Providing The Materials And Training; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Members of certain governing boards of public water systems; require continuing management training for.
Sponsors
Sen. Perry Lee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | DR - TSDP: EN To AC |
2013-01-21 | Senate | Referred To Energy;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2013/pdf/history/SB/SB2425.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2013/html/SB/2400-2499/SB2425IN.htm |