MS SB2419 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Conform To Certain Changes To The Model Act For The Uniform Commercial Code; To Amend Section 11-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform The Law On Implied Warranties, Limitations And Disclaimers To The Nonuniform Choice Of Law Provisions In The Mississippi Enactment Of The Uniform Commercial Code; To Create New Section 15-1-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide A Six-year Statute Of Limitations For Nonnegotiable Promissory Notes; To Create New Section 75-1-101, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact Short Titles For The Uniform Commercial Code And For Article 1; To Create New Section 75-1-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Scope Of The General Provisions Of Article 1; To Create New Section 75-1-103, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Uniform Construction Of The Uniform Commercial Code; To Create New Section 75-1-104, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Implied Repeal; To Create New Section 75-1-105, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Severability; To Create New Section 75-1-106, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Grammatical Construction Of Personal And Possessive Pronouns As To Gender; To Create New Section 75-1-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Section Captions Are Part Of The Act; To Create New Section 75-1-108, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Relationship Between The Act And The Electronic Signatures Act; To Create New Section 75-1-201, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Enact General Definitions; To Create New Section 75-1-202, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify When Both Notice And Knowledge Occur; To Create New Section 75-1-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Distinguish A Lease From A Security Interest; To Create New Section 75-1-204, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Specify When A Person Has Given Value; To Create New Section 75-1-205, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Reasonable Time And Seasonableness; To Create New Section 75-1-206, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Presumptions Of Fact; To Create New Section 75-1-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Choice Of Law; To Create New Section 75-1-302, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Variation By Agreement; To Create New Section 75-1-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Define Course Of Performance, Course Of Dealing, And Usage Of Trade; To Create New Section 75-1-304, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Good Faith; To Create New Section 75-1-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Liberal Administration Of Remedies; To Create New Section 75-1-306, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Waiver Or Renunciation Of Claim Or Right Upon Breach; To Create New Section 75-1-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Prima Facie Evidence By Third-party Documents; To Create New Section 75-1-308, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Performance Or Acceptance Under Reservation Of Rights; To Create New Section 75-1-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Allow The Option To Accelerate At Will; To Create New Section 75-1-310, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Subordination Of Obligations; To Amend Sections 75-2-103, 75-2-107, 75-2-202, 75-2a-103, 75-2a-501, 75-2a-51, 75-2a-518, 75-2a-527, 75-2a-528, 75-3-103, 75-3-106, 75-3-116, 75-3-119, 75-3-305, 75-3-309, 75-3-312, 75-3-415, 75-3-416, 75-3-417, 75-3-419, 75-3-602, 75-3-604, 75-3-605, 75-4-104, 75-4-105, 75-4-207, 75-4-208, 75-4-212, 75-4-301, 75-4-403, 75-4a-105, 75-4a-106, 75-4a-204, 75-5-103, 75-7-102, 75-8-102 And 75-9-102, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Create New Section 79-13-505, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Enforceability Of Limitations On Assignments Of Partnership Interests; To Create New Section 79-14-706, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Enforceability Of Limitations On Assignments Of Limited Partnership Interests; To Create New Section 1-3-81, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Editorial Nature Of Section Captions Unless Specifically Provided Otherwise By Law; To Repeal Sections 75-1-101, 75-1-102, 75-1-103, 75-1-104, 75-1-105, 75-1-106, 75-1-107, 75-1-108, 75-1-109, 75-1-110, 75-1-201, 75-1-202, 75-1-203, 75-1-204, 75-1-205, 75-1-206, 75-1-207 And 75-1-208, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Comprise The Uniform Commercial Code Article 1 - General Provisions, And Are Being Replaced By Revised Article 1 - General Provisions; To Repeal Section 75-2-208, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Practical Construction Of "course Of Performance" For Purposes Of The Uniform Commercial Code Article 2 - Sales, The Substance Thereof Being Reenacted In Revised Article 1 - General Provisions; To Repeal Section 75-2a-207, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Practical Construction Of "course Of Performance" For Purposes Of The Uniform Commercial Code Article 2a - Leases, The Substance Thereof Being Reenacted In Revised Article 1 - General Provisions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; revise to conform to model act (ULC).
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-25 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-17 - Senate - Senate Concurred in Amend From House (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-24 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Moak | |
2010-03-18 | Conferees Named Fillingane,Jackson (15th),Dickerson | |
2010-03-18 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-18 | Reconsidered | |
2010-03-17 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-17 | Concurred in Amend From House | |
2010-03-10 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-09 | Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-17 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-02-15 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-10 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-02-10 | Amended | |
2010-02-01 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-01-28 | DR - TSDPAA: JA To BF | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A;Business and Financial Institutions |