MS SB2413 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 23-15-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Election Officials From Spending Private Monetary Donations From Any Source, Directly Or Indirectly, On Any Communication To Potential Electors And Other Aspects Of Conducting Elections; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Elections; prohibit spending of private money on communications to electors and other election aspects.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Tate [R] | Sen. Jennifer Branning [R] | Sen. Jeremy England [R] | Sen. Daniel Sparks [R] |
Sen. Chris McDaniel [R] | Sen. Jason Barrett [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 41 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | House | Died In Committee |
2022-02-10 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Passed |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-01-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | Senate | Referred To Elections |