MS SB2413 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-5-34, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Custody And Visitation Procedure Upon A Parent Being Assigned To Military Temporary Duty, Deployment Or Mobilization; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Custody and visitation; clarify for parents on certain military duty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-26 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-26 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-04-01 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Conference Report Adopted | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-25 | Conference Report Filed | |
2010-03-23 | Conferees Named Blackmon,Cockerham,Moss | |
2010-03-18 | Conferees Named Fillingane,Hopson,Yancey | |
2010-03-17 | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf | |
2010-03-09 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2010-03-09 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-03 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-03 | Passed As Amended | |
2010-03-03 | Amended | |
2010-02-23 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2010-02-11 | Referred To Judiciary A | |
2010-02-04 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-02-03 | Passed | |
2010-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-11 | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |