MS SB2403 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-7-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The Headlights Of Vehicles Shall Be Operated Whenever Precipitation Or Other Conditions Result In Poor Visibility; To Prohibit The Use Of Only The Parking Lights Of Vehicles During Times When The Use Of Headlights Is Required; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Headlights; require use during precipitation.
Sponsors
Sen. Terry Burton [R] | Sen. Billy Hudson [R] | Sen. Robert Jackson [D] | Sen. Kenneth Jones [D] |
Sen. Haskins Montgomery [D] | Sen. Eric Powell [D] | Sen. J.P. Wilemon [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-03 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 42 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-01 | Died In Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Referred To Transportation | |
2011-02-08 | Transmitted To House | |
2011-02-03 | Passed | |
2011-02-03 | Committee Substitute Adopted | |
2011-01-26 | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub | |
2011-01-12 | Referred To Highways and Transportation |