MS SB2392 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-06 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-7-104.3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Starkville-oktibbeha Consolidated School District And Mississippi State University To Enter Into An Agreement For Constructing And Operating A Model Rural Education School For Sixth And Seventh Grade Students From Oktibbeha County; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Starkville-Oktibbeha Consolidated School District and Mississippi State University; may operate model rural school.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 110 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-06 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-31 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-03-30 | House | Returned For Enrolling |
2016-03-30 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2016-03-25 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Moore, Roberson) |
2016-03-25 | House | Passed |
2016-03-23 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-03-22 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-03-22 | House | DR - TSDP: AP To ED |
2016-03-18 | House | DR - TSDP: ED To AP |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred To Education;Appropriations |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmitted To House |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Passed |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2016-02-08 | Senate | Referred To Education |